HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 05:59:49

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/06/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Julie Akouele Beto against At T Corp Direct Tv in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2123
  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Other Disposed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Kenji Machida
  • Courthouse

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    Mbesse Florent
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Akouele Beto Julie
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    At &t Corp Direct Tv Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

[Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)]
5/8/2017: [Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)]
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
4/13/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/6/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
3/13/2017: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
  Fees Apply
Download
Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
3/13/2017: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
5/8/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Infor...
5/8/2017: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Infor...
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
5/8/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
5/8/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 05/08/2017
  • Updated -- Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court): Result Date changed from 03/06/2017 to 05/08/2017
  • 05/08/2017
  • Updated -- Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court): Result Date: 05/08/2017
  • 05/08/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims): Result: Granted by Operation of Law; Result Date: 05/08/2017
  • 05/08/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 05/08/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/08/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A updated: Result Date to 05/08/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 05/08/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Julie Akouele Beto, et al. on 03/06/2017: Defendant AT &T Corp Direct TV does not owe the plaintiffs Julie Akouele Beto; Florent Mbesse any money on plaintiff's claim.
  • 05/08/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: AT &T Corp Direct TV (Defendant)
  • 05/08/2017
  • Address for AT &T Corp Direct TV (Defendant) amendment
  • 05/08/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)]; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/08/2017
  • Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: AT &T Corp Direct TV (Defendant)
  • 04/13/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party; As to: AT &T Corp Direct TV (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: Yes; Service Date: 04/06/2017
  • 03/17/2017
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by: As to: AT &T Corp Direct TV (Defendant)
  • 03/17/2017
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by: As to: AT &T Corp Direct TV (Defendant)
  • 03/13/2017
  • Updated -- Request to Waive Court Fees: Result: Granted by Operation of Law; Result Date: 03/13/2017
  • 03/13/2017
  • Updated -- Request to Waive Court Fees: Result: Granted by Operation of Law; Result Date: 03/13/2017
  • 03/13/2017
  • Updated -- Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court): Status Date changed from 03/06/2017 to 03/13/2017
  • 03/13/2017
  • Updated -- Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court): Status Date changed from 03/06/2017 to 03/13/2017
  • 03/13/2017
  • Updated -- Request to Waive Court Fees: Result Date changed from 03/13/2017 to 03/13/2017
  • 03/13/2017
  • Updated -- Request to Waive Court Fees: Result Date changed from 03/13/2017 to 03/13/2017
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --