HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 05:59:46

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/06/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Paul Van Kleef against Cole Garcia in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2122
  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Dismissed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Ray A. Santana
  • Courthouse

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    Van Kleef Paul
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Garcia Cole Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
4/5/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/6/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before...
4/5/2017: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before...
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 06/06/2017
6/6/2017: Minute Order of 06/06/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
6/6/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 06/06/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 06/06/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/06/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90 updated: Result Date to 06/06/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 06/06/2017
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action
  • 06/06/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 04/05/2017
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Paul Van Kleef (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: No
  • 04/05/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/06/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90
  • 04/05/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/04/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court to 06/06/2017
  • 04/05/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Filed by: Clerk
  • 03/06/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Paul Van Kleef (Plaintiff); As to: Cole Garcia (Defendant)
  • 03/06/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: ST-2017-0011240 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/06/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Ray A. Santana at Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 90
  • 03/06/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/04/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --