HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 05:59:43

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/01/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Roger S Acceptance Corporation against Juan Rodriguez in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2121
  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Other Disposed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Kenji Machida
  • Courthouse

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Defendant

    Rodriguez Juan Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Roger's Acceptance Corporation
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service
4/10/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/1/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Rejection
6/27/2017: Notice of Rejection
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
5/3/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
5/3/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment...
7/14/2017: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgmen...
  Fees Apply
Download
Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
5/3/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2017
  • Invoice: Issuing,Writ, Acknowlgment, Abstract, Satisfaction-GC 70626(a)(1-2)(4-8); CCP 116.820; Fee: $25.00; Balance: $25.00;
  • 07/17/2017
  • Payment: Issuing,Writ, Acknowlgment, Abstract, Satisfaction-GC 70626(a)(1-2)(4-8); CCP 116.820; Amount: $25.00 Receipt: ST-2017-0016264 (Check)
  • 07/14/2017
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: Roger's Acceptance Corporation (Plaintiff); Interest: 8.57
  • 07/14/2017
  • Writ of Execution (Los Angeles)
  • 06/27/2017
  • Notice of Rejection; Issued by: Clerk
  • 05/03/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Roger's Acceptance Corporation against Defendant Juan Rodriguez on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Roger's Acceptance Corporation on 03/01/2017 for the principal amount of $592.05 and costs of $60.00 for a total of $652.05.
  • 05/03/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Roger's Acceptance Corporation (Plaintiff)
  • 05/03/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 05/03/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service by Substituted Service: Result: Result Date: 05/03/2017
  • 05/03/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 05/03/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/03/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A updated: Result Date to 05/03/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 04/10/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Roger's Acceptance Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Juan Rodriguez (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/20/2017; Service Cost: 30.00; Service Cost Waived: No
  • 03/06/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > 12 per year-Filing by person >12/year- CCP 116.230(c); Fee: $100.00; Payment: 100.00 Receipt: ST-2017-0011239 (Check); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/06/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/03/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A
  • 03/01/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Roger's Acceptance Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Juan Rodriguez (Defendant)
  • 03/01/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Kenji Machida at Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 1A
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --