HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/10/2017 09:54:50

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/06/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Oscar E Bados against Gupta Rupa in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2118
  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Dismissed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Kenji Machida
  • Courthouse

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Defendant

    Rupa Gupta Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Bados Oscar E
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
6/21/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
5/3/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/6/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before...
6/21/2017: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Befor...
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
5/3/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/07/2017
8/7/2017: Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/07/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
(Non-Jury Trial)
8/7/2017: (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/26/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A Not Held - Rescheduled by Court to 08/07/2017
  • 06/21/2017
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Oscar E Bados (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: No
  • 06/21/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Filed by:
  • 05/03/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 05/03/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/03/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A Not Held - Rescheduled by Court to
  • 05/03/2017
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Oscar E Bados (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: No
  • 05/03/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/07/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A
  • 03/06/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Oscar E Bados (Plaintiff); As to: Gupta Rupa (Defendant)
  • 03/06/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: ST-2017-0011234 (Cash); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/06/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Kenji Machida at Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 1A
  • 03/06/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/03/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A
  • 03/06/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/26/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --