HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/18/2017 09:12:22

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/06/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Joseph Chavez against City Of Los Angeles in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2116
  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Judgment Entered
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Ray A. Santana
  • Courthouse

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    Chavez Joseph
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    City Of Los Angeles Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
4/24/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/6/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 05/04/2017
5/4/2017: Minute Order of 05/04/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
7/20/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
5/4/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
5/4/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
7/20/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small...
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 07/20/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: City Of Los Angeles (Defendant)
  • 07/20/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 07/20/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims): Result Date changed from 05/04/2017 to 07/20/2017
  • 07/20/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/20/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90 updated: Result Date to 07/20/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 07/20/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/20/2017 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 33
  • 07/20/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 07/20/2017
  • Updated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: Result: Result Date: 07/20/2017
  • 07/20/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims): Result Date changed from 07/20/2017 to 07/20/2017
  • 07/20/2017
  • Updated -- Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims): Result: Result Date: 07/20/2017
  • 07/20/2017
  • Updated -- Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial): Result: Result Date: 07/20/2017
  • 07/20/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/20/2017 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 33 updated: Result Date to 07/20/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 07/02/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Joseph Chavez on 03/06/2017: Defendant City Of Los Angeles does not owe the plaintiff Joseph Chavez any money on plaintiff's claim.
  • 05/04/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/04/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion to 07/20/2017
  • 05/04/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: City Of Los Angeles (Defendant)
  • 05/04/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 05/04/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims): Result: Result Date: 05/04/2017
  • 05/04/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 05/04/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 04/24/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party; As to: City Of Los Angeles (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 04/19/2017
  • 04/24/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/20/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --