HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/18/2017 09:12:19

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/06/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Hassan Ibrahim against Crist Robin in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2108
  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Judgment Entered
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Ray A. Santana
  • Courthouse

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    Hall Jennifer
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Robin Crist Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Ibrahim Hassan
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
4/13/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/6/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
5/4/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
5/4/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 05/04/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 05/04/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/04/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90 updated: Result Date to 05/04/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 05/04/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Hassan Ibrahim; Plaintiff Jennifer Hall against Defendant Crist Robin on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Hassan Ibrahim, et al. on 03/06/2017 for the principal amount of $1,642.00 and costs of $115.00 for a total of $1,757.00.
  • 04/13/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Hassan Ibrahim (Plaintiff); Jennifer Hall (Plaintiff); As to: Crist Robin (Defendant); Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 04/11/17
  • 03/06/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Hassan Ibrahim (Plaintiff); Jennifer Hall (Plaintiff); As to: Crist Robin (Defendant)
  • 03/06/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: ST-2017-0011213 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/06/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Ray A. Santana at Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 90
  • 03/06/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/04/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --