HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 05:58:50

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/03/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Oportun Inc Dba Progress Financial Corp against Maria De Los Angele Hernandez in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2100
  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Dismissed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Kenji Machida
  • Courthouse

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    Oportun Inc. Dba Progress Financial Corp. Dba Progress Financial Corp. Dba Progress Financial Corp.
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Hernandez Maria De Los Angele Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - (Without Prejudice)
4/11/2017: Request for Dismissal - (Without Prejudice)
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
3/22/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
3/15/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/3/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Docu...
3/3/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Docu...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due
3/3/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/04/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/12/2017
  • 04/11/2017
  • Request for Dismissal (Without Prejudice); Filed by: Oportun Inc. DBA Progress Financial Corp. (Plaintiff); Maria De Los Angele Hernandez (Defendant)
  • 04/11/2017
  • Request for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action
  • 03/22/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Oportun Inc. DBA Progress Financial Corp. (Plaintiff); As to: Maria De Los Angele Hernandez (Defendant); Service Cost: 55.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 03/11/2017
  • 03/15/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Oportun Inc. DBA Progress Financial Corp. (Plaintiff); As to: Maria De Los Angele Hernandez (Defendant); Service Cost: 55.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 03/11/2017
  • 03/05/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > 12 per year-Filing by person >12/year- CCP 116.230(c); Fee: $100.00; Payment: 100.00 Receipt: 1170304E9356 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/05/2017
  • Invoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1170304E9356 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/05/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Kenji Machida at Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 1A
  • 03/05/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/04/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A
  • 03/05/2017
  • Updated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (w/ Fictitious Business Name): Name Extension: (w/ Fictitious Business Name)
  • 03/03/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Oportun Inc. DBA Progress Financial Corp. (Plaintiff); As to: Maria De Los Angele Hernandez (Defendant)
  • 03/03/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk
  • 03/03/2017
  • Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk
  • 03/03/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --