HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/14/2017 10:42:49

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/02/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Saeid B Maralan against Soojung Lim in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2096
  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Dismissed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Ray A. Santana
  • Courthouse

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    Maralan Saeid B
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Lim Soojung Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Maralan Mercedeh
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Unknown
8/28/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
5/2/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
7/26/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Docu...
3/2/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Docu...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due
3/2/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)
7/27/2017: Minute Order - (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)
7/27/2017: Minute Order - (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
7/26/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
5/3/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 07/27/2017
7/27/2017: Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 07/27/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 07/27/2017
7/27/2017: Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 07/27/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 07/26/2017
7/26/2017: Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 07/26/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
More Documents Available

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 10/10/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/10/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 10/10/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/10/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A updated: Result Date to 10/10/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 10/10/2017
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action
  • 08/28/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: saeid b maralan (Plaintiff); Mercedeh Maralan (Plaintiff); As to: soojung lim (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 08/23/2017; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No
  • 07/27/2017
  • On the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/26/2017 at 11:00 AM in at Department 1A Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion to 10/10/2017 08:30 AM at 10/10/2017 8:30 AM Non-Jury Trial in Department 1A
  • 07/27/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/10/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A
  • 07/27/2017
  • Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)
  • 07/27/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 07/27/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 07/27/2017
  • Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)
  • 07/27/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 07/27/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 07/26/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 07/26/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/26/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90 updated: Result Date to 07/26/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 07/26/2017
  • Case reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 1A; Reason: Non-Stipulation to Judicial Officer
  • 07/26/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/26/2017 at 11:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A
  • 07/26/2017
  • Address for saeid b maralan (Plaintiff) updated
  • 07/26/2017
  • Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: saeid b maralan (Plaintiff); Mercedeh Maralan (Plaintiff); As to: soojung lim (Defendant)
  • 07/26/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 07/26/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 07/26/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/03/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --