HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/18/2017 09:12:16

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/02/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Shoji Yano against Gary Urbina in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2091
  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Judgment Entered
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Kenji Machida
  • Courthouse

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Defendant

    Urbina Gary Dba Pan Partnership Inc Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Yano Shoji
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service
4/11/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/2/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
5/3/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Docu...
3/2/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Docu...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due
3/2/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
5/3/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
5/3/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 05/03/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service by Substituted Service: Result: Result Date: 05/03/2017
  • 05/03/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 05/03/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/03/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90 updated: Result Date to 05/03/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 05/03/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Shoji Yano on 03/02/2017: Defendant Gary Urbina DBA Pan Partnership, Inc does not owe the plaintiff Shoji Yano any money on plaintiff's claim.
  • 05/03/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Gary Urbina (Defendant)
  • 04/11/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Non-Party; As to: Gary Urbina (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 04/06/2017; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No
  • 03/04/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: 1170303E7061 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/04/2017
  • Invoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1170303E7061 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/04/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Kenji Machida at Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 90
  • 03/04/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/03/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90
  • 03/02/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Shoji Yano (Plaintiff); As to: Gary Urbina (Defendant)
  • 03/02/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk
  • 03/02/2017
  • Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk
  • 03/02/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --