HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/18/2017 09:12:13

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/02/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Hee Vin Kim against Alan Shermirani in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2090
  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Judgment Entered
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Ray A. Santana
  • Courthouse

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Defendant

    Shermirani Alan Dba Crocker Plaza Llc Dba Radix Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Kim Hee Vin Dba Sanvin America
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Unknown
8/22/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Unknown
9/18/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Unknown
9/18/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Unknown
9/1/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
6/27/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service by Substituted Service
3/30/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/2/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Postponement
6/27/2017: Notice of Postponement
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Docu...
3/2/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Docu...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due
3/2/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 05/08/2017
5/8/2017: Minute Order of 05/08/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
5/8/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
More Documents Available

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2017
  • Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: Hee Vin Kim (Plaintiff); As to: Alan Shermirani (Defendant); Type: Full Satisfaction
  • 10/12/2017
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 10/12/2017 ; Status Date changed from 08/22/2017 to 10/12/2017 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied
  • 10/12/2017
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 10/12/2017 ; Status Date changed from 10/12/2017 to 10/12/2017
  • 09/18/2017
  • Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment; Filed by: Alan Shermirani (Defendant)
  • 09/18/2017
  • Case reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 1A
  • 09/18/2017
  • Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal scheduled for 10/18/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A
  • 09/18/2017
  • Notice of Small Claims Appeal; Issued by: Clerk
  • 09/01/2017
  • Address for Hee Vin Kim (Plaintiff) updated
  • 09/01/2017
  • Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Hee Vin Kim (Plaintiff)
  • 08/22/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 08/22/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service by Substituted Service: Result: blank; Result Date changed from 05/08/2017 to 08/22/2017
  • 08/22/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk
  • 08/22/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/22/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90 updated: Result Date to 08/22/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 08/22/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Hee Vin Kim DBA Sanvin America against Defendant Alan Shermirani DBA Crocker Plaza, LLC, DBA RADIX on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Hee Vin Kim on 03/02/2017 for the principal amount of $7,350.00 and costs of $115.00 for a total of $7,465.00.
  • 06/27/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/18/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court to 08/22/2017
  • 06/27/2017
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Alan Shermirani (Defendant); Has the Claim Been Served?: Yes
  • 06/27/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims Request for Postponement - CCP 116.570; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: ST-2017-0015465 (Cash); Balance: $0.00;
  • 06/27/2017
  • Notice of Postponement; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/08/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 05/08/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service by Substituted Service: Result: Result Date: 05/08/2017
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --