HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 05:58:32

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/01/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Oscar H Gamez against North East Trees Inc A Nonprofit Corporation in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2089
  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Dismissed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Kenji Machida
  • Courthouse

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Defendant

    Kenyon Mark Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    North East Trees Inc. A Nonprofit Corporation Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Gamez Oscar H Aka Oscar H Gamez Cpa
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - (With Prejudice)
4/27/2017: Request for Dismissal - (With Prejudice)
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service by Substituted Service
3/14/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service by Substituted Service
3/14/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/1/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Docu...
3/1/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Docu...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due
3/1/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/02/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/01/2017
  • 04/27/2017
  • Request for Dismissal (With Prejudice); Filed by: oscar h gamez (Plaintiff); North East Trees, Inc., a nonprofit corporation (Defendant); Mark Kenyon (Defendant)
  • 04/27/2017
  • Request for dismissal With Prejudice entered as to entire action
  • 03/14/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: oscar h gamez (Plaintiff); As to: North East Trees, Inc., a nonprofit corporation (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/08/2017; Service Cost: 85.00; Service Cost Waived: No
  • 03/14/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: oscar h gamez (Plaintiff); As to: Mark Kenyon (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/09/2017; Service Cost: 85.00; Service Cost Waived: No
  • 03/04/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: 1170303E7025 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/04/2017
  • Invoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1170303E7025 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/04/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Kenji Machida at Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 1A
  • 03/04/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/02/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A
  • 03/01/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: oscar h gamez (Plaintiff); As to: North East Trees, Inc., a nonprofit corporation (Defendant); Mark Kenyon (Defendant)
  • 03/01/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk
  • 03/01/2017
  • Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk
  • 03/01/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --