HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/30/2017 10:41:33

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/03/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Raymond E Moreno Lancaster against G S Transit Management Inc in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2085
  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2017
  • Case Status

    Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Kenji Machida
  • Courthouse

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Defendant

    North American Risk Services Inc Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Wesco Insurance Company Inc. Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Essaey Maeys Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Moreno Lancaster Raymond E.
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    G & S Transit Management Inc. Dba City Cab Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
3/29/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
3/29/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
3/16/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/3/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
3/3/2017: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 05/04/2017
5/4/2017: Minute Order of 05/04/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
7/25/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
5/4/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 07/25/2017
7/25/2017: Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 07/25/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
5/4/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
7/25/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small...
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2017
  • On the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/25/2017 at 08:30 AM in at Department 1A Not Held - Continued - Court Congestion to 10/05/2017 08:30 AM at 10/05/2017 8:30 AM Non-Jury Trial in Department 1A
  • 07/25/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: G & S Transit Management Inc. (Defendant)
  • 07/25/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 07/25/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims): Result: blank; Result Date changed from 05/04/2017 to 07/25/2017
  • 07/25/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims): Result: blank; Result Date changed from 05/04/2017 to 07/25/2017
  • 07/25/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims): Result: blank; Result Date changed from 05/04/2017 to 07/25/2017
  • 07/25/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 07/25/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/04/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: G & S Transit Management Inc. (Defendant)
  • 05/04/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 05/04/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims): Result: Result Date: 05/04/2017
  • 05/04/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims): Result: Result Date: 05/04/2017
  • 05/04/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims): Result: Result Date: 05/04/2017
  • 05/04/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 05/04/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/04/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/04/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A Not Held - Continued - Court Congestion to 07/25/2017
  • 03/29/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party; As to: Wesco Insurance Company Inc. (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: Yes; Service Date: 03/16/2017
  • 03/29/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party; As to: North American Risk Services, Inc (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: Yes; Service Date: 03/16/2017
  • 03/29/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/25/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A
  • 03/16/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party; As to: Maeys Essaey (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: Yes; Service Date: 03/14/2017
  • 03/16/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/05/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A
  • 03/03/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Raymond E. Moreno Lancaster (Plaintiff); As to: G & S Transit Management Inc. (Defendant); Maeys Essaey (Defendant); Wesco Insurance Company Inc. (Defendant); North American Risk Services, Inc (Defendant)
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --