HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/18/2017 09:12:09

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/03/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Majirel Nabena against Candis Brown in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2084
  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Judgment Entered
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Ray A. Santana
  • Courthouse

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    Nabena Majirel Dba She Regal Hairess
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Brown Candis Dba The Brand Group Llc Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
4/26/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service by Substituted Service
6/21/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/3/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
6/26/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
6/26/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
6/26/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small...
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 06/26/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/26/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90 updated: Result Date to 06/26/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 06/26/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Majirel Nabena on 03/03/2017: Defendant Candis Brown DBA The Brand Group LLC does not owe the plaintiff Majirel Nabena DBA She Regal Hairess any money on plaintiff's claim.
  • 06/26/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Candis Brown (Defendant)
  • 06/26/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 06/21/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Majirel Nabena (Plaintiff); As to: Candis Brown (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 05/09/17; Service Cost: 48.00; Service Cost Waived: No
  • 04/26/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/26/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90
  • 04/26/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/03/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court to 06/26/2017
  • 04/26/2017
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Majirel Nabena (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: No
  • 03/03/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Majirel Nabena (Plaintiff); As to: Candis Brown (Defendant)
  • 03/03/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: ST-2017-0011168 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/03/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Ray A. Santana at Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 90
  • 03/03/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/03/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --