HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/13/2017 09:59:12

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/03/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Gregery E Bufkin against Robert A Smith Inc in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2082
  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Judgment Entered
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Kenji Machida
  • Courthouse

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Defendant

    Taylor Lisa Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Bufkin Gregery E
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Robert A Smith Inc. Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Bufkin Michelle C.
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Undetermined

    Bufkin Michelle C.
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Undetermined

    Bufkin Gregery E
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Undetermined

    Taylor Lisa
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Unknown
9/14/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service by Substituted Service
3/21/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
6/26/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/9/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 06/30/2017
6/30/2017: Minute Order of 06/30/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 05/02/2017
5/2/2017: Minute Order of 05/02/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
6/30/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
5/2/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Defendant's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
5/2/2017: Defendant's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Declaration (name extension) - / RE: Proof of serv...
4/19/2017: Declaration (name extension) - / RE: Proof of ser...
  Fees Apply
Download
Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
6/30/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small...
  Fees Apply
Download
Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
5/2/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
  Fees Apply
Download
More Documents Available

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Robert A Smith INC. (Defendant)
  • 09/14/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Robert A Smith INC. (Defendant)
  • 09/14/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 09/14/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service by Substituted Service: Result: blank; Result Date changed from 06/30/2017 to 09/14/2017
  • 09/14/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims): Result: blank; Result Date changed from 06/30/2017 to 09/14/2017
  • 09/14/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk
  • 09/14/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/14/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A updated: Result Date to 09/14/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 09/14/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered on the Amended Plaintiff's Claim (1st) filed by Gregery E Bufkin, et al. on 03/09/2017 as follows: Defendants Lisa Taylor; Robert A Smith INC. do not owe the plaintiffs Gregery E Bufkin; Michelle C. Bufkin any money on plaintiff's claim.
  • 09/14/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered on the Defendant's Claim filed by Lisa Taylor on 05/02/2017 as follows: Plaintiffs Gregery E Bufkin; Michelle C. Bufkin do not owe the defendant Lisa Taylor any money on defendant's claim.
  • 06/30/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Gregery E Bufkin (Plaintiff)
  • 06/30/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 06/30/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service by Substituted Service: Result Date changed from 05/02/2017 to 06/30/2017
  • 06/30/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims): Result: Result Date: 06/30/2017
  • 06/30/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 06/30/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 06/30/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/30/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A RES to 09/14/2017
  • 06/26/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Lisa Taylor (Defendant); As to: Gregery E Bufkin (Plaintiff); Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 06/16/2017
  • 06/26/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/14/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A
  • 05/02/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 05/02/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service by Substituted Service: Result: Result Date: 05/02/2017
  • 05/02/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 05/02/2017; Filed by: Clerk
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --