HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 05:58:17

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/03/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Francisco Estrada against Faisal Alameri in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2080
  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Dismissed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Ray A. Santana
  • Courthouse

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Defendant

    Alameri Faisal Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Estrada Francisco
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/3/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 05/05/2017
5/5/2017: Minute Order of 05/05/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
5/5/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 05/05/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 05/05/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/05/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/05/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90 updated: Result Date to 05/05/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 05/05/2017
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action
  • 03/03/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Francisco Estrada (Plaintiff); As to: Faisal Alameri (Defendant)
  • 03/03/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: ST-2017-0011164 (Check); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/03/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Ray A. Santana at Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 90
  • 03/03/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/05/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --