HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 05:58:11

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/03/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Carlos Mino against Sonia Khanam in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2078
  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Other Disposed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Ray A. Santana
  • Courthouse

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    Mino Carlos
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Khanam Sonia Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
3/21/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/3/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
5/5/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
5/5/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment
6/22/2017: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2017
  • Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: Carlos Mino (Plaintiff); As to: Sonia Khanam (Defendant); Type: Full Satisfaction
  • 06/22/2017
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 06/22/2017 ; Status Date changed from 05/05/2017 to 06/22/2017 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied
  • 06/22/2017
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 06/22/2017 ; Status Date changed from 06/22/2017 to 06/22/2017
  • 05/05/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Carlos Mino against Defendant Sonia Khanam on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Carlos Mino on 03/03/2017 for the principal amount of $3,016.76 and costs of $90.00 for a total of $3,106.76.; This judgment results from a motor vehicle accident on a California highway and was caused by the judgment debtor's operation of a motor vehicle. If the judgment is not paid, the judgment creditor may apply to have the judgment debtor's drivers license suspended.
  • 05/05/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 05/05/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims): Result: Result Date: 05/05/2017
  • 05/05/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 05/05/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/05/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90 updated: Result Date to 05/05/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 03/21/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Carlos Mino (Plaintiff); As to: Sonia Khanam (Defendant); Service Cost: 89.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 03/10/2017
  • 03/03/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Carlos Mino (Plaintiff); As to: Sonia Khanam (Defendant)
  • 03/03/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: ST-2017-0011162 (Cash); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/03/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Ray A. Santana at Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 90
  • 03/03/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/05/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --