HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 05:58:06

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/03/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Carlos Mino against Francisco Aurelio Maldonado in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2077
  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Dismissed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Kenji Machida
  • Courthouse

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    Mino Carlos
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Maldonado Francisco Aurelio Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Renoj Nelson Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

[Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declarati...
5/3/2017: [Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declarati...
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service by Substituted Service
3/21/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service by Substituted Service
3/21/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/3/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaratio...
5/3/2017: Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaratio...
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 06/22/2017
6/22/2017: Minute Order of 06/22/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 05/02/2017
5/2/2017: Minute Order of 05/02/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
5/2/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vac...
6/22/2017: Minute Order - (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Va...
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2017
  • Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment)
  • 06/22/2017
  • Updated -- Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial): Result: Result Date: 06/22/2017
  • 06/22/2017
  • Updated -- Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration: Result: Result Date: 06/22/2017
  • 06/22/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 06/22/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 06/22/2017
  • Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment scheduled for 06/22/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A updated: Result Date to 06/22/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 05/03/2017
  • Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration; Filed by: Carlos Mino (Plaintiff)
  • 05/03/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims Motion to Vacate - CCP 116.745; Fee: $20.00; Payment: 20.00 Receipt: ST-2017-0013383 (Cash); Balance: $0.00;
  • 05/03/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration]; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/02/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 05/02/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/02/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/02/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A updated: Result Date to 05/02/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 05/02/2017
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action
  • 05/02/2017
  • Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment scheduled for 06/22/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A
  • 05/02/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 05/02/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service by Substituted Service: Result: Result Date: 05/02/2017
  • 05/02/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service by Substituted Service: Result: Result Date: 05/02/2017
  • 03/21/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Carlos Mino (Plaintiff); As to: Francisco Aurelio Maldonado (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/11/2017; Service Cost: 54.50; Service Cost Waived: No
  • 03/21/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Carlos Mino (Plaintiff); As to: Nelson Renoj (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/11/2017; Service Cost: 54.50; Service Cost Waived: No
  • 03/03/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Carlos Mino (Plaintiff); As to: Francisco Aurelio Maldonado (Defendant); Nelson Renoj (Defendant)
  • 03/03/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: ST-2017-0011161 (Cash); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/03/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Kenji Machida at Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 1A
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --