HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/24/2017 10:13:57

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/03/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Celine Carmen Nicholson against Daniel Lee Tovar in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2074
  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Dismissed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Ray A. Santana
  • Courthouse

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    Nicholson Celine Carmen
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Tovar Daniel Lee Dba Premier Leasing Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Unknown
8/3/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
7/3/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
5/3/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - No Service
4/14/2017: Proof of Service - No Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - No Service
5/19/2017: Proof of Service - No Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
5/25/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims...
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before...
7/3/2017: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before...
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before...
5/3/2017: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before...
  Fees Apply
Download
Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
3/3/2017: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
7/3/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
5/3/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/22/2017
8/22/2017: Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/22/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
More Documents Available

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 08/22/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/22/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 08/22/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/22/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90 updated: Result Date to 08/22/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 08/22/2017
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action
  • 08/03/2017
  • Proof of Service - No Service; Filed by:
  • 07/03/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 07/03/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/03/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court to
  • 07/03/2017
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Celine Carmen Nicholson (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: No
  • 07/03/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/22/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90
  • 07/03/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/25/2017
  • Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court 2nd Amend; Filed by: Celine Carmen Nicholson (Plaintiff); As to: Daniel Lee Tovar (Defendant)
  • 05/19/2017
  • Proof of Service - No Service; Filed by: Celine Carmen Nicholson (Plaintiff); As to: Daniel Lee Tovar (Defendant); Costs: 35.00
  • 05/03/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 05/03/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/03/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court to
  • 05/03/2017
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Celine Carmen Nicholson (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: No
  • 05/03/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/03/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90
  • 05/03/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/03/2017
  • Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Celine Carmen Nicholson (Plaintiff); As to: Daniel Lee Tovar (Defendant)
  • 05/03/2017
  • Updated -- Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court 2nd Amend: Name Extension: 2nd Amend
  • 04/14/2017
  • Proof of Service - No Service; Filed by: Non-Party; As to: Daniel Lee Tovar (Defendant)
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --