HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/13/2017 10:22:07

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/03/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Reyhanna Ferrin against Angela Lynn Szczesiul in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2068
  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2017
  • Case Status

    Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Ray A. Santana
  • Courthouse

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    Ferrin Reyhanna
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Undetermined

    Olan Christina
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Szczesuil Nathan Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Szczesiul Angela Lynn Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Szczesiul Nathan Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Undetermined

    Olan Christina
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
4/13/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service by Substituted Service
6/7/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service by Substituted Service
6/7/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - No Service
4/11/2017: Proof of Service - No Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - No Service
4/11/2017: Proof of Service - No Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/3/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
3/3/2017: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 06/22/2017
6/22/2017: Minute Order of 06/22/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
6/22/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian ...
3/3/2017: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian ...
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2017
  • Updated -- Nathan Szczesiul (Defendant): Last Name changed from Szczesuil to Szczesiul
  • 06/22/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 06/22/2017
  • Updated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem: Result Date changed from 03/03/2017 to 06/22/2017
  • 06/22/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service - No Service: Result: Granted; Result Date: 06/22/2017
  • 06/22/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service - No Service: Result: Granted; Result Date: 06/22/2017
  • 06/22/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service by Substituted Service: Result: Granted; Result Date: 06/22/2017
  • 06/22/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service by Substituted Service: Result: Granted; Result Date: 06/22/2017
  • 06/22/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 06/22/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 06/22/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/22/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90 Not Held - Continued - Ex Parte Motion to
  • 06/07/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Reyhanna Ferrin (Plaintiff); As to: Angela Lynn Szczesiul (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 06/07/2017; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No
  • 06/07/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Reyhanna Ferrin (Plaintiff); As to: Nathan Szczesuil (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 06/07/2017; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No
  • 04/13/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/03/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court to 06/22/2017
  • 04/13/2017
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Reyhanna Ferrin (Plaintiff); Christina Olan (Non-Party); Has the Claim Been Served?: No
  • 04/11/2017
  • Proof of Service - No Service; Filed by: Non-Party; As to: Nathan Szczesuil (Defendant); Costs: 35.00
  • 04/11/2017
  • Proof of Service - No Service; Filed by: Non-Party; As to: Angela Lynn Szczesiul (Defendant); Costs: 0.00
  • 03/06/2017
  • Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by: Christina Olan (Non-Party); As to: Reyhanna Ferrin (Plaintiff)
  • 03/03/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Reyhanna Ferrin (Plaintiff); Christina Olan (Non-Party); As to: Angela Lynn Szczesiul (Defendant); Nathan Szczesuil (Defendant)
  • 03/03/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/22/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90
  • 03/03/2017
  • Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Reyhanna Ferrin (Plaintiff)
  • 03/03/2017
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Reyhanna Ferrin (Plaintiff)
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --