HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/30/2017 10:18:09

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/02/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Merced Muro against Fidel Delgado in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2053
  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Other Disposed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Ray A. Santana
  • Courthouse

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    Muro Merced
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Delgado Fidel Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

[Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declarati...
5/11/2017: [Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declarat...
  Fees Apply
Download
Unknown
9/13/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
3/15/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/2/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaratio...
5/11/2017: Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declarati...
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 06/19/2017
6/19/2017: Minute Order of 06/19/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
5/2/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vac...
6/19/2017: Minute Order - (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Va...
  Fees Apply
Download
(Non-Jury Trial)
9/13/2017: (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 09/13/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk
  • 09/13/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/13/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90 updated: Result Date to 09/13/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 09/13/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Merced Muro against Defendant Fidel Delgado on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Merced Muro on 03/02/2017 for the principal amount of $950.00 and costs of $70.00 for a total of $1,020.00.; This judgment results from a motor vehicle accident on a California highway and was caused by the judgment debtor's operation of a motor vehicle. If the judgment is not paid, the judgment creditor may apply to have the judgment debtor's drivers license suspended.
  • 06/19/2017
  • Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment)
  • 06/19/2017
  • Updated -- Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims): Result: Vacated; Result Date: 06/19/2017
  • 06/19/2017
  • Updated -- Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration: Result: Granted; Result Date: 06/19/2017
  • 06/19/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 06/19/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 06/19/2017
  • Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment scheduled for 06/19/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90 updated: Result Date to 06/19/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 06/19/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/13/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90
  • 06/19/2017
  • Updated -- On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Merced Muro on 03/02/2017, judgment entered on 05/02/2017 is vacated
  • 06/19/2017
  • On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Merced Muro on 03/02/2017, judgment entered on 05/02/2017 as to Fidel Delgado is vacated
  • 05/11/2017
  • Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration; Filed by: Fidel Delgado (Defendant)
  • 05/11/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims Motion to Vacate - CCP 116.745; Fee: $20.00; Payment: 20.00 Receipt: ST-2017-0013706 (Cash); Balance: $0.00;
  • 05/11/2017
  • Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment scheduled for 06/19/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90
  • 05/11/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration]; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/02/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Merced Muro against Defendant Fidel Delgado on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Merced Muro on 03/02/2017 for the principal amount of $950.00 and costs of $70.00 for a total of $1,020.00.; This judgment results from a motor vehicle accident on a California highway and was caused by the judgment debtor's operation of a motor vehicle. If the judgment is not paid, the judgment creditor may apply to have the judgment debtor's drivers license suspended.
  • 05/02/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 05/02/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims): Result: Result Date: 05/02/2017
  • 05/02/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --