HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 05:57:19

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/02/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Susan Davila against Jessica April Villarreal in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2047
  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Dismissed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Ray A. Santana
  • Courthouse

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Defendant

    Villarreal Jessica April Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Davila Susan
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Monster Energy Company Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - (With Prejudice)
4/27/2017: Request for Dismissal - (With Prejudice)
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
4/19/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
4/14/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/2/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2017
  • Request for Dismissal (With Prejudice); Filed by: Susan Davila (Plaintiff)
  • 04/27/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/02/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/27/2017
  • 04/27/2017
  • Request for dismissal With Prejudice entered as to entire action
  • 04/19/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Susan Davila (Plaintiff); As to: Monster Energy Company (Defendant); Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 04/11/2017
  • 04/14/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party; As to: Jessica April Villarreal (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 04/11/2017
  • 03/15/2017
  • Invoice: Fee Preparing Copy of any Record(per page) - GC70627(a); Fee: $3.00; Balance: $3.00;
  • 03/15/2017
  • Payment: Fee Preparing Copy of any Record(per page) - GC70627(a); Amount: $3.00 Receipt: ST-2017-0011594 (Cash)
  • 03/02/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Susan Davila (Plaintiff); As to: Jessica April Villareal (Defendant); Monster Energy Company (Defendant)
  • 03/02/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: ST-2017-0011070 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/02/2017
  • Invoice: Fee Preparing Copy of any Record(per page) - GC70627(a); Fee: $3.00; Payment: 3.00 Receipt: ST-2017-0011070 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/02/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Ray A. Santana at Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 90
  • 03/02/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/02/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90
  • 03/02/2017
  • Updated -- Jessica April Villarreal (Defendant): Last Name changed from Villareal to Villarreal
  • 03/02/2017
  • ** Case Name changed from SUSAN DAVILA vs JESSICA APRIL VILLAREAL, et al. to SUSAN DAVILA vs JESSICA APRIL VILLARREAL, et al.
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --