HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/10/2017 09:59:31

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/02/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Ninfa Lopez Gomez against Felix Romero in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2045
  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Dismissed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Kenji Machida
  • Courthouse

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    Gomez Ninfa Lopez
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Romero Felix Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
4/28/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/2/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
3/2/2017: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 05/02/2017
5/2/2017: Minute Order of 05/02/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
5/2/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/01/2017
8/1/2017: Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/01/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
(Non-Jury Trial)
8/1/2017: (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 08/01/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims): Result: blank; Result Date changed from 05/02/2017 to 08/01/2017
  • 08/01/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/01/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 08/01/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/01/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A updated: Result Date to 08/01/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 08/01/2017
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action
  • 05/02/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims): Result: Result Date: 05/02/2017
  • 05/02/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 05/02/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/02/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/02/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion to 08/01/2017
  • 05/02/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 04/28/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Ninfa Lopez Gomez (Plaintiff); As to: Felix Romero (Defendant); Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 04/09/2017
  • 04/28/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/01/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A
  • 03/02/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Ninfa Lopez Gomez (Plaintiff); As to: Felix Romero (Defendant)
  • 03/02/2017
  • Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Ninfa Lopez Gomez (Plaintiff)
  • 03/02/2017
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Ninfa Lopez Gomez (Plaintiff)
  • 03/02/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: ST-2017-0011063 (Waived Court); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/02/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Kenji Machida at Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 1A
  • 03/02/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/02/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --