HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/18/2017 09:11:40

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/02/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Tina Hodges against Cam Ix Trust in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2044
  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Judgment Entered
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Ray A. Santana
  • Courthouse

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    Hodges Tina
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Servis One Inc. Dba Bsi Financial Services Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Cam Ix Trust Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

[Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment and Answer]
5/10/2017: [Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment and Answer...
  Free
Download
Order on Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment
5/23/2017: Order on Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment
  Free
Download
Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment and Answer
5/10/2017: Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment and Answer
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
4/21/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
4/7/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/2/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
5/2/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 05/23/2017
5/23/2017: Minute Order of 05/23/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
5/2/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Court Order)
5/23/2017: Minute Order - (Court Order)
  Fees Apply
Download
Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
5/2/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
5/2/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2017
  • Minute Order (Court Order)
  • 05/23/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 05/23/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/23/2017
  • Order on Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Cam IX Trust (Defendant); Servis One Inc. (Defendant)
  • 05/10/2017
  • Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment and Answer; Filed by: Tina Hodges (Plaintiff)
  • 05/10/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment and Answer]; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/02/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 05/02/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims): Result: Result Date: 05/02/2017
  • 05/02/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 05/02/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/02/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90 updated: Result Date to 05/02/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 05/02/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Tina Hodges on 03/02/2017: Defendants Servis One Inc. DBA BSI Financial Services; Cam IX Trust do not owe the plaintiff Hodges, Tina any money on plaintiff's claim.
  • 05/02/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Servis One Inc. (Defendant)
  • 05/02/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Cam IX Trust (Defendant)
  • 04/21/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Tina Hodges (Plaintiff); As to: Servis One Inc. (Defendant); Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 03/16/17
  • 04/07/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party; As to: Servis One Inc. (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 03/28/2017
  • 03/02/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Tina Hodges (Plaintiff); As to: Cam IX Trust (Defendant); Servis One Inc. (Defendant)
  • 03/02/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: ST-2017-0011061 (Cash); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/02/2017
  • Invoice: Fee Preparing Copy of any Record(per page) - GC70627(a); Fee: $6.00; Payment: 6.00 Receipt: ST-2017-0011061 (Cash); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/02/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Ray A. Santana at Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 90
  • 03/02/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/02/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --