HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 05:57:09

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/02/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Gregory Gallegos against Pedro Gallegos in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2043
  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Dismissed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Ray A. Santana
  • Courthouse

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    Gallegos Gregory
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Gallegos Pedro Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/2/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
3/2/2017: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 04/13/2017
4/13/2017: Minute Order of 04/13/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
4/13/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 04/13/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 04/13/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/13/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90 updated: Result Date to 04/13/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 04/13/2017
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action
  • 04/13/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 04/13/2017
  • Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
  • 03/02/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Gregory Gallegos (Plaintiff); As to: Pedro Gallegos (Defendant)
  • 03/02/2017
  • Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Gregory Gallegos (Plaintiff)
  • 03/02/2017
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Gregory Gallegos (Plaintiff)
  • 03/02/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: ST-2017-0011060 (Waived Court); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/02/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Ray A. Santana at Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 90
  • 03/02/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/13/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90
  • 03/02/2017
  • Updated -- Request to Waive Court Fees: Result Date changed from 03/02/2017 to 03/02/2017

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --