HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/18/2017 09:11:32

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/02/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Aleyda Salazar against Carnaval De Auto Inc in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2040
  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Judgment Entered
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Ray A. Santana
  • Courthouse

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    Salazar Aleyda
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Carnaval De Auto Inc. Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

[Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declarati...
5/8/2017: [Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declarati...
  Free
Download
Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaratio...
5/8/2017: Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaratio...
  Free
Download
Minute Order - (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vac...
6/14/2017: Minute Order - (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Va...
  Free
Download
Proof of Service by Substituted Service
3/15/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/2/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
5/2/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 06/14/2017
6/14/2017: Minute Order of 06/14/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
5/2/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2017
  • Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment)
  • 06/14/2017
  • Updated -- Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims): Result: Result Date: 06/14/2017
  • 06/14/2017
  • Updated -- Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration: Result: Result Date: 06/14/2017; Disposition Type: Denied; Disposition Date changed from 06/14/2017 to 06/14/2017
  • 06/14/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 06/14/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 06/14/2017
  • Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment scheduled for 06/14/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90 updated: Result Date to 06/14/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 05/08/2017
  • Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration; Filed by: Carnaval de Auto Inc. (Defendant)
  • 05/08/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims Motion to Vacate - CCP 116.745; Fee: $20.00; Payment: 20.00 Receipt: ST-2017-0013547 (Cash); Balance: $0.00;
  • 05/08/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration]; Issued by: Clerk
  • 05/02/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/02/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90 updated: Result Date to 05/02/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 05/02/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Aleyda Salazar against Defendant Carnaval de Auto Inc. on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Aleyda Salazar on 03/02/2017 for the principal amount of $2,976.00 and costs of $115.00 for a total of $3,091.00.
  • 05/02/2017
  • Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment scheduled for 06/14/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90
  • 05/02/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 05/02/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service by Substituted Service: Result: Result Date: 05/02/2017
  • 05/02/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 03/15/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Non-Party; As to: Carnaval de Auto Inc. (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/10/2017; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No
  • 03/02/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Aleyda Salazar (Plaintiff); As to: Carnaval de Auto Inc. (Defendant)
  • 03/02/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: ST-2017-0011054 (Cash); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/02/2017
  • Invoice: Fee Preparing Copy of any Record(per page) - GC70627(a); Fee: $3.00; Payment: 3.00 Receipt: ST-2017-0011054 (Cash); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/02/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Ray A. Santana at Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 90
  • 03/02/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/02/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --