HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/30/2017 09:07:50

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/03/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Oportun Inc Fka Progress Financial Corp against Manuel De Jesus Lima in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX1782
  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Other Disposed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    William Mctaggart
  • Courthouse

    Inglewood Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Defendant

    Lima Manuel De Jesus Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Oportun Inc. Fka Progress Financial Corp.
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Unknown
8/23/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service by Substituted Service
4/13/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service by Substituted Service
4/6/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/3/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Docu...
3/3/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Docu...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due
3/3/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 07/03/2017
7/3/2017: Minute Order of 07/03/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 05/02/2017
5/2/2017: Minute Order of 05/02/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
5/2/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
7/3/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/23/2017 and Ju...
8/23/2017: Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/23/2017 and J...
  Fees Apply
Download
Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
5/2/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
  Fees Apply
Download
More Documents Available

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 08/23/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service by Substituted Service: Result: blank; Result Date changed from 07/03/2017 to 08/23/2017
  • 08/23/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service by Substituted Service: Result: blank; Result Date changed from 07/03/2017 to 08/23/2017
  • 08/23/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/23/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk
  • 08/23/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk
  • 08/23/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/23/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 08/23/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 08/23/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Oportun Inc. FKA Progress Financial Corp. against Defendant Manuel De Jesus Lima on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Oportun Inc. FKA Progress Financial Corp. on 03/03/2017 for the principal amount of $845.00 and costs of $105.00 for a total of $950.00.
  • 08/23/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party
  • 07/03/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 07/03/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service by Substituted Service: Result Date changed from 05/02/2017 to 07/03/2017
  • 07/03/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service by Substituted Service: Result Date changed from 05/02/2017 to 07/03/2017
  • 07/03/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 07/03/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 07/03/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/03/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion to 08/23/2017
  • 07/03/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Oportun Inc. FKA Progress Financial Corp. (Plaintiff)
  • 05/02/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 05/02/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service by Substituted Service: Result: Result Date: 05/02/2017
  • 05/02/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service by Substituted Service: Result: Result Date: 05/02/2017
  • 05/02/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 05/02/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/02/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/02/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion to 07/03/2017
  • 05/02/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Oportun Inc. FKA Progress Financial Corp. (Plaintiff)
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --