HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/18/2017 09:10:58

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/03/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Andrew Leeds against Canon Usa Inc in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX1778
  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Judgment Entered
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    William Mctaggart
  • Courthouse

    Inglewood Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Defendant

    Corporation Service Company - Lawyers Incorporating Service Dba Csc Dba Canon U.S.A Inc Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Leeds Andrew
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Canon Usa Inc. Dba Csc Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Minute Order of 06/26/2017 and Judgment Debtor Sta...
6/26/2017: Minute Order of 06/26/2017 and Judgment Debtor St...
  Free
Download
Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment
7/24/2017: Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment
  Free
Download
Unknown
8/2/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Unknown
7/28/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
5/2/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
5/18/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
5/2/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Small Claims Appeal - (Trial De Novo)
7/24/2017: Notice of Small Claims Appeal - (Trial De Novo)
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
6/26/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Docu...
3/3/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Docu...
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
6/26/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
6/26/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small...
  Fees Apply
Download
More Documents Available

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2017
  • Address for Canon USA, Inc. (Defendant) updated
  • 09/11/2017
  • Minute Order (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal)
  • 09/11/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal) of 09/11/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 09/11/2017
  • On the Court's own motion, Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal scheduled for 09/11/2017 at 08:30 AM in at Department 8 Held - Continued to 11/21/2017 08:30 AM at 11/21/2017 8:30 AM Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal in Department 8
  • 08/03/2017
  • Pursuant to the request of defendant, Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal scheduled for 08/25/2017 at 08:30 AM in at Department 8 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court to 09/11/2017 08:30 AM at 09/11/2017 8:30 AM Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal in Department 8
  • 08/03/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)]; Issued by: Clerk
  • 08/02/2017
  • Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: As to: Andrew Leeds (Plaintiff)
  • 08/02/2017
  • Updated -- Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims): Result: Granted; Result Date: 08/02/2017
  • 07/28/2017
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Canon USA, Inc. (Defendant); Has the Claim Been Served?: Yes
  • 07/24/2017
  • Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment; Filed by: Canon USA, Inc. (Defendant)
  • 07/24/2017
  • Notice of Small Claims Appeal (Trial De Novo); Filed by: Clerk
  • 07/24/2017
  • Case reassigned to Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8
  • 07/24/2017
  • Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal scheduled for 08/25/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8
  • 06/26/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 06/26/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims): Result: Result Date: 06/26/2017
  • 06/26/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 06/26/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk
  • 06/26/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 06/26/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/26/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 06/26/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 06/26/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Andrew Leeds against Defendant Canon USA, Inc. DBA CSC on the Amended Plaintiff's Claim (1st) filed by Andrew Leeds on 05/02/2017 for the principal amount of $4,192.14 and costs of $77.50 for a total of $4,269.64.
  • 06/26/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --