HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 05:56:28

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/03/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Joshua David Wayser against Impluz Inc A Corporation in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX1777
  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Dismissed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    William Mctaggart
  • Courthouse

    Inglewood Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Defendant

    Pele Enterprises Inc. A Corporation Dba Le Savon Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Impluz Inc. A Corporation Dba Le Savon Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Wayser Joshua David
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service
3/20/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service by Substituted Service
3/20/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/3/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Docu...
3/3/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Docu...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due
3/3/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 05/02/2017
5/2/2017: Minute Order of 05/02/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)
5/2/2017: Minute Order - (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
5/2/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 05/02/2017
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action , pursuant to court order
  • 05/02/2017
  • Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)
  • 05/02/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 05/02/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/02/2017
  • Nunc Pro Tunc Order scheduled for 05/02/2017 at 03:49 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 Not Held - Clerical Error on 05/02/2017
  • 05/02/2017
  • Order for dismissal With Prejudice entered as to entire action , pursuant to 664.6
  • 05/02/2017
  • Dismissal entered on 05/02/2017, as to entire action is Vacated - .
  • 03/20/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Joshua David Wayser (Plaintiff); As to: Impluz, Inc., a corporation (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/06/2017; Service Cost: 270.25; Service Cost Waived: No
  • 03/20/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Joshua David Wayser (Plaintiff); As to: Pele Enterprises, Inc., a corporation (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/06/2017; Service Cost: 135.13; Service Cost Waived: No
  • 03/05/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: 1170304E9611 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/05/2017
  • Invoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1170304E9611 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/05/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. William McTaggart at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8
  • 03/05/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/02/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8
  • 03/03/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Joshua David Wayser (Plaintiff); As to: Impluz, Inc., a corporation (Defendant); Pele Enterprises, Inc., a corporation (Defendant)
  • 03/03/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk
  • 03/03/2017
  • Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk
  • 03/03/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --