HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 05:55:54

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/02/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Dollar Loan Center California Llc against Carol Denise Martin in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX1767
  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Other Disposed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Ronald Frank
  • Courthouse

    Inglewood Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Defendant

    Martin Carol Denise Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Dollar Loan Center California Llc
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
5/4/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
5/16/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/2/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
7/6/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Docu...
3/2/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Docu...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due
3/2/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 07/06/2017 and Judgment Debtor Sta...
7/6/2017: Minute Order of 07/06/2017 and Judgment Debtor Sta...
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
7/6/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
7/6/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
5/4/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2017
  • Writ of Execution (los angeles); Issued by: Clerk; County: los angeles; Principal: 2,615.00; Interest: 0.00; Costs: 0.00
  • 07/06/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party
  • 07/06/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 07/06/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 07/06/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk
  • 07/06/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 07/06/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/06/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 07/06/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 07/06/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Dollar Loan Center California, LLC against Defendant Carol Denise Martin on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Dollar Loan Center California, LLC on 03/02/2017 for the principal amount of $2,500.00 and costs of $115.00 for a total of $2,615.00.
  • 05/16/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Dollar Loan Center California, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Carol Denise Martin (Defendant); Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 05/07/2017
  • 05/04/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/06/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8
  • 05/04/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/04/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court to 07/06/2017
  • 05/04/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Dollar Loan Center California, LLC (Plaintiff)
  • 05/04/2017
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Dollar Loan Center California, LLC (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: No
  • 03/05/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > 12 per year-Filing by person >12/year- CCP 116.230(c); Fee: $100.00; Payment: 100.00 Receipt: 1170304E9592 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/05/2017
  • Invoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1170304E9592 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/05/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Ronald Frank at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8
  • 03/05/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/04/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8
  • 03/02/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Dollar Loan Center California, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Carol Denise Martin (Defendant)
  • 03/02/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk
  • 03/02/2017
  • Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk
  • 03/02/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --