HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/15/2017 10:48:12

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/02/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Ran Noy against Theresia Tjandrawansa in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX1763
  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2017
  • Case Status

    Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    William Mctaggart
  • Courthouse

    Inglewood Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Defendant

    Tjandrawansa Andrew Widyono Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Tjandrawansa Theresia Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Noy Ran
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Mercury Insurance Group Dba Mercury General Dba Mercury Insurance Dba Mercury Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Unknown
8/2/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
3/23/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
3/23/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/2/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
7/6/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Docu...
3/2/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Docu...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due
3/2/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 07/06/2017 and Judgment Debtor Sta...
7/6/2017: Minute Order of 07/06/2017 and Judgment Debtor Sta...
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 05/02/2017
5/2/2017: Minute Order of 05/02/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
7/6/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
5/2/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
7/6/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2017
  • Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: Ran noy (Plaintiff); As to: Theresia Tjandrawansa (Defendant); Type: Full Satisfaction
  • 08/02/2017
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 08/02/2017 ; Status Date changed from 07/06/2017 to 08/02/2017 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied
  • 08/02/2017
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 08/02/2017 ; Status Date changed from 08/02/2017 to 08/02/2017
  • 07/06/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party
  • 07/06/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 07/06/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims): Result Date changed from 05/02/2017 to 07/06/2017
  • 07/06/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims): Result Date changed from 05/02/2017 to 07/06/2017
  • 07/06/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 07/06/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk
  • 07/06/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 07/06/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/06/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 07/06/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 07/06/2017
  • On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Ran noy on 03/02/2017, Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to Mercury Insurance group
  • 07/06/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Ran noy against Defendant Theresia Tjandrawansa on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Ran noy on 03/02/2017 for the principal amount of $2,000.00 and costs of $150.00 for a total of $2,150.00.; This judgment results from a motor vehicle accident on a California highway and was caused by the judgment debtor's operation of a motor vehicle. If the judgment is not paid, the judgment creditor may apply to have the judgment debtor's drivers license suspended.; Other: The defendant, Andrew Widyono Tjandrawansa, does not owe any money on plaintiff's claim.
  • 05/02/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 05/02/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims): Result: Result Date: 05/02/2017
  • 05/02/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims): Result: Result Date: 05/02/2017
  • 05/02/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 05/02/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/02/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/02/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 Not Held - Continued - Court Congestion to 07/06/2017
  • 03/23/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Ran noy (Plaintiff); As to: Mercury Insurance group (Defendant); Service Cost: 50.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 03/21/2017
  • 03/23/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/06/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8
  • 03/23/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Ran noy (Plaintiff); As to: Theresia Tjandrawansa (Defendant); Service Cost: 50.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 03/14/2017
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --