HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/18/2017 09:10:54

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/03/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Carolyn Davis against Lisa M Carter in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX1761
  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Judgment Entered
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    William Mctaggart
  • Courthouse

    Inglewood Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    Davis Carolyn
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Carter Lisa M. Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Minute Order of 05/02/2017 and Judgment Debtor Sta...
5/2/2017: Minute Order of 05/02/2017 and Judgment Debtor Sta...
  Free
Download
RETURNED MAIL - - Notice of Entry of Judgment and ...
5/8/2017: RETURNED MAIL - - Notice of Entry of Judgment and ...
  Free
Download
Proof of Service by Substituted Service
3/7/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/3/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
5/2/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
5/2/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2017
  • Updated -- RETURNED MAIL - Notice of Entry of Judgment and Minute Order Dated May 2, 2017: As To Parties: Lisa M. Carter (Defendant)
  • 05/08/2017
  • RETURNED MAIL - Notice of Entry of Judgment and Minute Order Dated May 2, 2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/02/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/02/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 05/02/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 05/02/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Carolyn Davis against Defendant Lisa M. Carter on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Carolyn Davis on 03/03/2017 for the principal amount of $5,000.00 and costs of $50.00 for a total of $5,050.00.
  • 05/02/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 05/02/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service by Substituted Service: Result: Result Date: 05/02/2017
  • 05/02/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 05/02/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/02/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 03/07/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Carolyn Davis (Plaintiff); As to: Lisa M. Carter (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/04/2017; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No
  • 03/03/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Carolyn Davis (Plaintiff); As to: Lisa M. Carter (Defendant)
  • 03/03/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0010346 (Cash); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/03/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. William McTaggart at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8
  • 03/03/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/02/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --