HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 05:55:30

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/03/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Tashman Screens Hardware Inc against Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX1756
  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Dismissed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    William Mctaggart
  • Courthouse

    Inglewood Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    Tashman Screens & Hardware Inc. Dba Tashman Home Center
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/3/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 05/02/2017
5/2/2017: Minute Order of 05/02/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
5/2/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Fictitious Business Name (Small Claims)
3/3/2017: Fictitious Business Name (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
3/3/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
5/2/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Affidavit (name extension) - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/...
4/17/2017: Affidavit (name extension) - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE...
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 05/02/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/02/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/02/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/02/2017
  • 05/02/2017
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action , pursuant to court order
  • 05/02/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (Defendant)
  • 05/02/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 05/02/2017
  • Updated -- Affidavit AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/NON-SERVICE: Result: Result Date: 05/02/2017
  • 04/17/2017
  • Affidavit AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/NON-SERVICE; Filed by: Tashman Screens & Hardware, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (Defendant)
  • 03/03/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Tashman Screens & Hardware, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (Defendant)
  • 03/03/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0010335 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/03/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. William McTaggart at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8
  • 03/03/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/02/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8
  • 03/03/2017
  • Fictitious Business Name (Small Claims); Filed by: Tashman Screens & Hardware, Inc. (Plaintiff)
  • 03/03/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Tashman Screens & Hardware, Inc. (Plaintiff)
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --