HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 05:55:27

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/03/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Dennis Chester against United Airlines Inc in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX1755
  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Dismissed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    William Mctaggart
  • Courthouse

    Inglewood Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    Chester Dennis
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    United Airlines Inc Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - (With Prejudice)
4/6/2017: Request for Dismissal - (With Prejudice)
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
3/23/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/3/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2017
  • Request for Dismissal (With Prejudice); Filed by: Dennis Chester (Plaintiff)
  • 04/06/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/02/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/06/2017
  • 04/06/2017
  • Request for dismissal With Prejudice entered as to entire action
  • 03/23/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Dennis Chester (Plaintiff); As to: United Airlines, Inc (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 03/22/2017
  • 03/03/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Dennis Chester (Plaintiff); As to: United Airlines, Inc (Defendant)
  • 03/03/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0010334 (Cash); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/03/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. William McTaggart at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8
  • 03/03/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/02/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --