HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 05:55:23

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/03/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Rane Bruton against Patricia Rathburn in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX1754
  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Dismissed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    William Mctaggart
  • Courthouse

    Inglewood Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Defendant

    Rathburn Patricia Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Bruton Rane
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
4/11/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Request for Dismissal - (Without Prejudice)
5/24/2017: Request for Dismissal - (Without Prejudice)
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service by Substituted Service
3/28/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/3/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
3/3/2017: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Postponement
4/11/2017: Notice of Postponement
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2017
  • Request for Dismissal (Without Prejudice); Filed by: Rane Bruton (Plaintiff); As to: Patricia Rathburn (Defendant)
  • 05/24/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/13/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/24/2017
  • 05/24/2017
  • On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Rane Bruton on 03/03/2017, Request for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to Patricia Rathburn
  • 04/11/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims Request for Postponement - CCP 116.570; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0011770 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;
  • 04/11/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/01/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court to 06/13/2017
  • 04/11/2017
  • Notice of Postponement; Issued by: Clerk
  • 04/11/2017
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Patricia Rathburn (Defendant); Has the Claim Been Served?: Yes
  • 03/28/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Rane Bruton (Plaintiff); As to: Patricia Rathburn (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/27/2017; Service Cost: 185.00; Service Cost Waived: No
  • 03/28/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/13/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8
  • 03/03/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Rane Bruton (Plaintiff); As to: Patricia Rathburn (Defendant)
  • 03/03/2017
  • Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Rane Bruton (Plaintiff)
  • 03/03/2017
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Rane Bruton (Plaintiff)
  • 03/03/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0010333 (Waived Court); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/03/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. William McTaggart at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8
  • 03/03/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/01/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --