HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 05:55:17

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/03/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Ariel Montelli against Frank Martini in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX1752
  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Other Disposed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    William Mctaggart
  • Courthouse

    Inglewood Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Defendant

    Martini Frank Dba Adventurer Hotel Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Montelli Ariel
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Undetermined

    Martini Frank Dba Adventurer Hotel
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Undetermined

    Montelli Ariel
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Unknown
7/27/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
RETURNED MAIL - ( minute order of 05/01/2017 )
5/12/2017: RETURNED MAIL - ( minute order of 05/01/2017 )
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service by Substituted Service - SERVED: ...
3/20/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - SERVED:...
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/3/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
3/3/2017: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Small Claims Appeal
7/27/2017: Notice of Small Claims Appeal
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs
7/19/2017: Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
7/20/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 07/19/2017 and Judgment Debtor Sta...
7/19/2017: Minute Order of 07/19/2017 and Judgment Debtor St...
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 05/01/2017
5/1/2017: Minute Order of 05/01/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
5/1/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Defendant's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
4/7/2017: Defendant's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
More Documents Available

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2017
  • Minute Order (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal)
  • 09/01/2017
  • Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal scheduled for 09/01/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 09/01/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 07/27/2017
  • Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment; Filed by: Frank Martini (Defendant)
  • 07/27/2017
  • Case reassigned to Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8
  • 07/27/2017
  • Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal scheduled for 09/01/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8
  • 07/27/2017
  • Notice of Small Claims Appeal; Issued by: Clerk
  • 07/20/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 07/19/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 07/19/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service by Substituted Service SERVED: KIM WOHL, ASSISTANT: Result Date changed from 05/01/2017 to 07/19/2017
  • 07/19/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 07/19/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk
  • 07/19/2017
  • Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs; Filed by: Clerk
  • 07/19/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/19/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 07/19/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 07/19/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Ariel Montelli against Defendant Frank Martini DBA Adventurer Hotel on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Ariel Montelli on 03/03/2017 for the principal amount of $1,000.00 and costs of $115.00 for a total of $1,115.00.; Waived fees and costs in the amount of $115.00, including those incurred after judgment, must be paid directly to the court by Defendant Frank Martini DBA Adventurer Hotel. A full or partial satisfaction of judgment will not be entered unless waived fees are paid per Government Code section 68637(b)(1). An Administrative fee of $25.00 must be assessed if the collection process is initiated to collect unpaid fees per Government Code section 68638.
  • 07/19/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered on the Defendant's Claim filed by Frank Martini on 04/07/2017: Plaintiff Ariel Montelli does not owe the defendant Frank Martini DBA Adventurer Hotel any money on defendant's claim.
  • 05/12/2017
  • RETURNED MAIL ( minute order of 05/01/2017 ); Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/02/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/01/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 Not Held - Continued - Court Congestion to 07/19/2017
  • 05/01/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 05/01/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service by Substituted Service SERVED: KIM WOHL, ASSISTANT: Result: Result Date: 05/01/2017
  • 05/01/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 05/01/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 04/07/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0011678 (Check); Balance: $0.00;
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --