HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/17/2017 10:21:38

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/03/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Prince Cameron against Frank Martini in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX1750
  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Other Disposed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    William Mctaggart
  • Courthouse

    Inglewood Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Defendant

    Martini Frank Dba Adventurer All Suites Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Cameron Prince
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Undetermined

    Martini Frank Dba Adventurer All Suites
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Undetermined

    Cameron Prince
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

RETURNED MAIL - ( minute order of 05/01/2017 )
5/12/2017: RETURNED MAIL - ( minute order of 05/01/2017 )
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service by Substituted Service - SERVED: ...
3/20/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - SERVED:...
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/3/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
3/3/2017: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
7/20/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 07/19/2017
7/19/2017: Minute Order of 07/19/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 05/01/2017
5/1/2017: Minute Order of 05/01/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
7/19/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
5/1/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Defendant's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
4/7/2017: Defendant's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 07/19/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 07/19/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service by Substituted Service SERVED: KIM WOHL, ASSISTANT: Result Date changed from 05/01/2017 to 07/19/2017
  • 07/19/2017
  • Updated -- RETURNED MAIL ( minute order of 05/01/2017 ): Result: Result Date: 07/19/2017
  • 07/19/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 07/19/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 07/19/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/19/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 07/19/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 07/19/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Prince Cameron on 03/03/2017: Defendant Frank Martini DBA Adventurer All Suites does not owe the plaintiff Prince Cameron any money on plaintiff's claim.
  • 07/19/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered on the Defendant's Claim filed by Frank Martini on 04/07/2017: Plaintiff Prince Cameron does not owe the defendant Frank Martini DBA Adventurer All Suites any money on defendant's claim.
  • 05/12/2017
  • RETURNED MAIL ( minute order of 05/01/2017 ); Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/02/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/01/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 Not Held - Continued - Court Congestion to 07/19/2017
  • 05/01/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 05/01/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service by Substituted Service SERVED: KIM WOHL, ASSISTANT: Result: Result Date: 05/01/2017
  • 05/01/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 05/01/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 04/07/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0011679 (Check); Balance: $0.00;
  • 04/07/2017
  • Defendant's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Small Claims); Filed by: Frank Martini (Defendant); As to: Prince Cameron (Plaintiff)
  • 03/20/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service SERVED: KIM WOHL, ASSISTANT; Filed by: Prince Cameron (Plaintiff); As to: Frank Martini (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/16/17; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: Yes
  • 03/20/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/19/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8
  • 03/03/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Prince Cameron (Plaintiff); As to: Frank Martini (Defendant)
  • 03/03/2017
  • Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Prince Cameron (Plaintiff)
  • 03/03/2017
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Prince Cameron (Plaintiff)
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --