HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/21/2017 09:04:46

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/03/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Sandra Yvette Stokes against Avery Alexis Scott in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX1749
  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2017
  • Case Status

    Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    William Mctaggart
  • Courthouse

    Inglewood Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    Stokes Sandra Yvette
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Zahng Yu Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Scott Avery Alexis Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Wanda Jean Scott-smart Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Unknown
9/21/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Unknown
8/16/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - RESET F...
5/3/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - RESET F...
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
7/3/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
6/5/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - No Service - PROOF OF UNSUCCESS...
6/19/2017: Proof of Service - No Service - PROOF OF UNSUCCES...
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - No Service
7/3/2017: Proof of Service - No Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
7/6/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 07/06/2017
7/6/2017: Minute Order of 07/06/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
7/6/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
5/3/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/24/2017
8/24/2017: Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/24/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
More Documents Available

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2017
  • Notice of Case Relocation Rescheduling; Filed by: Clerk
  • 09/21/2017
  • On the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/18/2017 at 01:30 PM in at Department 8 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court to 01/09/2018 08:30 AM at 01/09/2018 8:30 AM Non-Jury Trial in Department 8
  • 08/25/2017
  • On the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/24/2017 at 01:30 PM in at Department 8 Not Held - Continued - Court Congestion to 10/18/2017 01:30 PM at 10/18/2017 1:30 PM Non-Jury Trial in Department 8
  • 08/24/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 08/24/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims): Result: blank; Result Date changed from 07/06/2017 to 08/24/2017
  • 08/24/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service - No Service PROOF OF UNSUCCESSFUL SERVICE: Result: blank; Result Date changed from 07/06/2017 to 08/24/2017
  • 08/24/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service - No Service: Result: blank; Result Date changed from 07/06/2017 to 08/24/2017
  • 08/24/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims): Result: blank; Result Date changed from 07/06/2017 to 08/24/2017
  • 08/24/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/24/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 08/16/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Sandra Yvette Stokes (Plaintiff); As to: Scott-Smart Wanda Jean (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 07/31/2017; Service Cost: 39.00; Service Cost Waived: No
  • 07/06/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 07/06/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims): Result: Result Date: 07/06/2017
  • 07/06/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service - No Service PROOF OF UNSUCCESSFUL SERVICE: Result: Result Date: 07/06/2017
  • 07/06/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service - No Service: Result: Result Date: 07/06/2017
  • 07/06/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims): Result: Result Date: 07/06/2017
  • 07/06/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 07/06/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 07/06/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/06/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion to 08/24/2017
  • 07/06/2017
  • On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Sandra Yvette Stokes on 03/03/2017, Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to Yu Zahng
  • 07/06/2017
  • Updated -- Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: Status Date changed from 03/03/2017 to 07/06/2017
  • 07/03/2017
  • Proof of Service - No Service; Filed by: Sandra Yvette Stokes (Plaintiff); As to: Avery Alexis Scott (Defendant); Yu Zahng (Defendant)
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --