HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/18/2017 09:10:38

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/03/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by 2021 Walnut Llc - Jarrod Roback Manager against Ismael Aceves-escobar in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX1748
  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Judgment Entered
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    William Mctaggart
  • Courthouse

    Inglewood Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    2021 Walnut Llc - Matthew Parrish Manager
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    2021 Walnut Llc - Jarrod Roback Manager
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Aceves-escobar Ismael Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Minute Order of 07/05/2017 and Judgment Debtor Sta...
7/5/2017: Minute Order of 07/05/2017 and Judgment Debtor Sta...
  Free
Download
[Application and Order to Produce Statement of Ass...
9/25/2017: [Application and Order to Produce Statement of As...
  Fees Apply
Download
Unknown
9/22/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service by Substituted Service
3/21/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/3/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
7/5/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 05/01/2017
5/1/2017: Minute Order of 05/01/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
5/1/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
7/5/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
5/1/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
5/1/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination]; Issued by: Clerk
  • 09/22/2017
  • Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination; Filed by: 2021 WALNUT LLC - Matthew Parrish, Manager (Plaintiff); As to: Ismael Aceves-Escobar (Defendant)
  • 09/19/2017
  • Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination; Filed by: 2021 WALNUT LLC - Matthew Parrish, Manager (Plaintiff); As to: Ismael Aceves-Escobar (Defendant)
  • 09/19/2017
  • Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination scheduled for 11/17/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8
  • 07/05/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 07/05/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service by Substituted Service: Result Date changed from 05/01/2017 to 07/05/2017
  • 07/05/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 07/05/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk
  • 07/05/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 07/05/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/05/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 07/05/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 07/05/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff 2021 WALNUT LLC - Matthew Parrish, Manager; Plaintiff 2021 WALNUT LLC - Jarrod Roback, Manager against Defendant Ismael Aceves-Escobar on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by 2021 WALNUT LLC - Jarrod Roback, Manager, et al. on 03/03/2017 for the principal amount of $5,000.00 and costs of $105.00 for a total of $5,105.00.
  • 05/02/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/01/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 Not Held - Continued - Court Congestion to 07/05/2017
  • 05/01/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service by Substituted Service: Result: Result Date: 05/01/2017
  • 05/01/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 05/01/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/01/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: 2021 WALNUT LLC - Jarrod Roback, Manager (Plaintiff)
  • 05/01/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: 2021 WALNUT LLC - Matthew Parrish, Manager (Plaintiff)
  • 05/01/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 03/21/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: 2021 WALNUT LLC - Jarrod Roback, Manager (Plaintiff); 2021 WALNUT LLC - Matthew Parrish, Manager (Plaintiff); As to: Ismael Aceves-Escobar (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/12/2017; Service Cost: 55.00; Service Cost Waived: No
  • 03/21/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/05/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8
  • 03/03/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: 2021 WALNUT LLC - Jarrod Roback, Manager (Plaintiff); 2021 WALNUT LLC - Matthew Parrish, Manager (Plaintiff); As to: Ismael Aceves-Escobar (Defendant)
  • 03/03/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0010322 (Cash); Balance: $0.00;
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --