HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 05:55:02

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/03/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Frank A Gagliano against Beverly Westwood Condominiums Hoa in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX1747
  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Dismissed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    William Mctaggart
  • Courthouse

    Inglewood Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    Gagliano Frank A.
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Beverly Westwood Condominiums Hoa Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - (Without Prejudice)
4/6/2017: Request for Dismissal - (Without Prejudice)
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/3/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2017
  • Invoice: Facsimile Filing Fee (per page) - CRC 10.815; LOCAL RULE 2.22; Fee: $2.25; Balance: $2.25;
  • 04/06/2017
  • Payment: Facsimile Filing Fee (per page) - CRC 10.815; LOCAL RULE 2.22; Amount: $2.25 Receipt: IW-2017-0011581 (Credit Card)
  • 04/06/2017
  • Request for Dismissal (Without Prejudice); Filed by: Frank A. Gagliano (Plaintiff); As to: Beverly Westwood Condominiums HOA (Defendant)
  • 04/06/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/04/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/06/2017
  • 04/06/2017
  • On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Frank A. Gagliano on 03/03/2017, Request for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to Beverly Westwood Condominiums HOA
  • 03/03/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Frank A. Gagliano (Plaintiff); As to: Beverly Westwood Condominiums HOA (Defendant)
  • 03/03/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0010321 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/03/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. William McTaggart at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8
  • 03/03/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/04/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --