HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/18/2017 09:10:31

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/03/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Ashley Schlaifer against Michael T Duong in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX1745
  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Judgment Entered
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    William Mctaggart
  • Courthouse

    Inglewood Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Defendant

    Wingfield Rodney D. Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Schlaifer Ashley
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Duong Michael T. Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Minute Order of 06/20/2017 and Judgment Debtor Sta...
6/20/2017: Minute Order of 06/20/2017 and Judgment Debtor St...
  Free
Download
[Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declarati...
6/23/2017: [Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declarat...
  Free
Download
Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaratio...
6/23/2017: Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declarati...
  Free
Download
Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/18/2017 and Ju...
8/18/2017: Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/18/2017 and J...
  Free
Download
Unknown
8/18/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - SERVE...
4/24/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - SERV...
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
5/23/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
4/21/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/3/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Postponement
4/21/2017: Notice of Postponement
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
6/20/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
6/20/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
More Documents Available

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 08/18/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/18/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk
  • 08/18/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk
  • 08/18/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/18/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 08/18/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 08/18/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Ashley Schlaifer against Defendant Rodney D. Wingfield and Defendant Michael T. Duong on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Ashley Schlaifer on 03/03/2017 for the principal amount of $2,350.00 and costs of $125.00 for a total of $2,475.00, joint and several.; Other: The Court finds that the Defendants, represented at trial by Mr. Duong, met their burden of proof only as to 750 worth of the deductions taken from the $3,100 security deposit. Ms. Schlaifer is thus awarded a refund of the remaining $2,350. The parties presented conflicting evidence on the bad faith element of Plaintiff's claimed damages, and the Court finds that the 1/11/17 email was a good faith attempt to identify the landlord's intention to withhold at least some of the security deposit pending collection of estimates and invoices for various items of repair. A more comprehensive listing of the claimed items was presented at trial than had ever been previously co...
  • 07/21/2017
  • Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment)
  • 07/21/2017
  • Updated -- Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration: Result: Result Date: 07/21/2017; Disposition Type: Granted; Disposition Date changed from 07/21/2017 to 07/21/2017
  • 07/21/2017
  • Updated -- Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims): Result: Vacated; Result Date: 07/21/2017
  • 07/21/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 07/21/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 07/21/2017
  • Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment scheduled for 07/21/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 07/21/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 07/21/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/18/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8
  • 07/21/2017
  • Updated -- On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Ashley Schlaifer on 03/03/2017, judgment entered on 06/20/2017 is vacated
  • 07/21/2017
  • On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Ashley Schlaifer on 03/03/2017, judgment entered on 06/20/2017 as to Michael T. Duong is vacated
  • 07/21/2017
  • On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Ashley Schlaifer on 03/03/2017, judgment entered on 06/20/2017 as to Rodney D. Wingfield is vacated
  • 06/23/2017
  • Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration; Filed by: Michael T. Duong (Defendant); Rodney D. Wingfield (Defendant)
  • 06/23/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims Motion to Vacate - CCP 116.745; Fee: $20.00; Payment: 20.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0014408 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;
  • 06/23/2017
  • Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment scheduled for 07/21/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8
  • 06/23/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration]; Issued by: Clerk
  • 06/20/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 06/20/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) SERVED TO 05/02/17 DATE ONLY AT 01:30 pm: Result: Result Date: 06/20/2017
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --