HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 05:54:58

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/03/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Roy Banuelos against Ebay Inc in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX1744
  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Dismissed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    William Mctaggart
  • Courthouse

    Inglewood Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    Banuelos Roy
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Ebay Inc. Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

[Notice of Postponement]
4/14/2017: [Notice of Postponement]
  Fees Apply
Download
Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
4/13/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
3/22/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/3/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
3/3/2017: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Postponement
4/14/2017: Notice of Postponement
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 06/13/2017
6/13/2017: Minute Order of 06/13/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
6/13/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
6/13/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small...
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party
  • 06/13/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 06/13/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 06/13/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 06/13/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/13/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 06/13/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 06/13/2017
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action
  • 04/14/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/13/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8
  • 04/14/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/02/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court to 06/13/2017
  • 04/14/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims Request for Postponement - CCP 116.570; Fee: $10.00; Balance: $10.00;
  • 04/14/2017
  • Notice of Postponement; Filed by:
  • 04/14/2017
  • Notice of Postponement; Issued by: Clerk
  • 04/14/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Postponement]; Issued by: Clerk
  • 04/14/2017
  • Payment: Small Claims Request for Postponement - CCP 116.570; Amount: $10.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0011898 (Check)
  • 04/13/2017
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: eBay Inc. (Defendant); Has the Claim Been Served?: Yes
  • 04/13/2017
  • Updated -- Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims): Result: Granted; Result Date: 04/13/2017; As To Parties: Roy Banuelos (Plaintiff)
  • 03/22/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Roy Banuelos (Plaintiff); As to: eBay Inc. (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: Yes; Service Date: 03/14/2017
  • 03/03/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Roy Banuelos (Plaintiff); As to: eBay Inc. (Defendant)
  • 03/03/2017
  • Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Roy Banuelos (Plaintiff)
  • 03/03/2017
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Roy Banuelos (Plaintiff)
  • 03/03/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0010318 (Waived Court); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/03/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. William McTaggart at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --