HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/18/2017 09:10:27

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/03/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Traditional Development Group Inc against Irahlyn Simbajon Pogoy in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX1742
  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Judgment Entered
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    William Mctaggart
  • Courthouse

    Inglewood Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Defendant

    Thompson Travon Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Traditional Development Group Inc.
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Pogoy Irahlyn Simbajon Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Minute Order of 05/02/2017 and Judgment Debtor Sta...
5/2/2017: Minute Order of 05/02/2017 and Judgment Debtor Sta...
  Free
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
4/11/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/3/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
5/2/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
5/2/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
5/2/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/02/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 05/02/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 05/02/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Traditional Development Group Inc. against Defendant Travon Thompson; Defendant Irahlyn Simbajon Pogoy on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Traditional Development Group Inc. on 03/03/2017 for the principal amount of $900.00 and costs of $70.00 for a total of $970.00.
  • 05/02/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party
  • 05/02/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 05/02/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims): Result: Result Date: 05/02/2017
  • 05/02/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 05/02/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/02/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 04/11/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Traditional Development Group Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Travon Thompson (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 04/10/2017
  • 03/03/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Traditional Development Group Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Irahlyn Simbajon Pogoy (Defendant); Travon Thompson (Defendant)
  • 03/03/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims <= $1,500: Filing for $1,500 or less- CCP 116.230(b)(1); Fee: $30.00; Payment: 30.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0010313 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/03/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. William McTaggart at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8
  • 03/03/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/02/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --