HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/18/2017 09:10:24

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/03/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Edward Simonian against Estate Of E J Euler Authur Maturo 111 Administrator in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX1741
  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Judgment Entered
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    William Mctaggart
  • Courthouse

    Inglewood Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    Simonian Edward
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Estate Of E.J. Euler Authur Maturo 111 Administrator Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
3/23/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/3/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
6/30/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 06/30/2017
6/30/2017: Minute Order of 06/30/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 05/01/2017
5/1/2017: Minute Order of 05/01/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
6/30/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
5/1/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 06/30/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 06/30/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 06/30/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 06/30/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/30/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 06/30/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 06/30/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Edward Simonian on 03/03/2017: Defendant Estate of E.J. Euler, Authur Maturo 111, administrator does not owe the plaintiff Simonian, Edward any money on plaintiff's claim.
  • 05/02/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/30/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8
  • 05/02/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/01/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 Not Held - Continued - Court Congestion to 06/30/2017
  • 05/01/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 05/01/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 05/01/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 03/23/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Edward Simonian (Plaintiff); As to: Estate of E.J. Euler, Authur Maturo 111, administrator (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 03/20/2017
  • 03/03/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Edward Simonian (Plaintiff); As to: Estate of E.J. Euler, Authur Maturo 111, administrator (Defendant)
  • 03/03/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0010310 (Check); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/03/2017
  • Invoice: Fee Preparing Copy of any Record(per page) - GC70627(a); Fee: $5.00; Payment: 5.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0010310 (Check); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/03/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. William McTaggart at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8
  • 03/03/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/01/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --