HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 05:54:40

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/03/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Hassan Bodaghi against Sarah Paulson Sheehy in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX1738
  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Dismissed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Ronald Frank
  • Courthouse

    Inglewood Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Defendant

    Sheehy Sarah Paulson Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Bodaghi Hassan
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
3/27/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Request for Dismissal - (Without Prejudice)
5/25/2017: Request for Dismissal - (Without Prejudice)
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service by Substituted Service - (w/Decl....
4/3/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - (w/Decl....
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/27/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims...
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2017
  • Request for Dismissal (Without Prejudice); Filed by: Hassan Bodaghi (Plaintiff); As to: Sarah Paulson Sheehy (Defendant)
  • 05/25/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/26/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/25/2017
  • 05/25/2017
  • On the Amended Plaintiff's Claim (1st) filed by Hassan Bodaghi on 03/03/2017, Request for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to Sarah Paulson Sheehy
  • 04/03/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service (w/Decl. Due Diligence); Filed by: Hassan Bodaghi (Plaintiff); As to: Sarah Paulson Sheehy (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/29/2017; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No
  • 03/27/2017
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Hassan Bodaghi (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: No
  • 03/27/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/26/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8
  • 03/27/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/05/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court to 05/26/2017
  • 03/27/2017
  • Updated -- Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: Status Date changed from 03/03/2017 to 03/27/2017
  • 03/03/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Hassan Bodaghi (Plaintiff); As to: Sarah Paulson Sheehy (Defendant)
  • 03/03/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0010297 (Check); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/03/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Ronald Frank at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8
  • 03/03/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/12/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8
  • 03/03/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/05/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8
  • 03/03/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/12/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court to 05/05/2017
  • 03/03/2017
  • Invoice: Fee Preparing Copy of any Record(per page) - GC70627(a); Fee: $5.00; Balance: $5.00;
  • 03/03/2017
  • Payment: Fee Preparing Copy of any Record(per page) - GC70627(a); Amount: $5.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0010300 (Cash)
  • 03/03/2017
  • Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Hassan Bodaghi (Plaintiff); As to: Sarah Paulson Sheehy (Defendant)
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --