HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 05:54:36

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/03/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Jennifer Amaya against Norcio Construction Inc in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX1737
  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Other Disposed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    William Mctaggart
  • Courthouse

    Inglewood Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    Amaya Jennifer
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Norcio Construction Inc. Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Undetermined

    Norcio Construction Inc.
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Undetermined

    Amaya Jennifer
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
4/5/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/3/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
3/3/2017: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - (Amen...
7/20/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - (Ame...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
7/20/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 07/19/2017
7/19/2017: Minute Order of 07/19/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 05/01/2017
5/1/2017: Minute Order of 05/01/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)
7/20/2017: Minute Order - (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
7/19/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
5/1/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Defendant's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
6/8/2017: Defendant's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
5/1/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
  Fees Apply
Download
More Documents Available

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 07/20/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Jennifer Amaya on 03/03/2017: Defendant Norcio Construction Inc. does not owe the plaintiff Jennifer Amaya any money on plaintiff's claim.
  • 07/20/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered on the Defendant's Claim filed by Norcio Construction Inc. on 06/08/2017: Plaintiff Jennifer Amaya does not owe the defendant Norcio Construction Inc. any money on defendant's claim.
  • 07/20/2017
  • Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)
  • 07/20/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Amended Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 07/20/2017
  • Nunc Pro Tunc Order scheduled for 07/20/2017 at 12:12 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 Not Held - Clerical Error on 07/20/2017
  • 07/20/2017
  • Updated -- Judgment amended on 07/20/2017 ; Status changed from Entered to Amended
  • 07/20/2017
  • Updated -- Judgment amended on 07/20/2017 ; Status changed from Entered to Amended
  • 07/19/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 07/19/2017
  • Updated -- Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims): Result: Result Date: 07/19/2017
  • 07/19/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 07/19/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 07/19/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/19/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 07/19/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 07/19/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Norcio Construction Inc. (Defendant)
  • 06/08/2017
  • Invoice: Fee Preparing Copy of any Record(per page) - GC70627(a); Fee: $0.50; Balance: $0.50;
  • 06/08/2017
  • Invoice: Fee Preparing Copy of any Record(per page) - GC70627(a); Fee: $2.50; Balance: $2.50;
  • 06/08/2017
  • Defendant's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Small Claims); Filed by: Norcio Construction Inc. (Defendant); As to: Jennifer Amaya (Plaintiff)
  • 06/08/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0013873 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;
  • 06/08/2017
  • Payment: Fee Preparing Copy of any Record(per page) - GC70627(a); Amount: $2.50 Receipt: IW-2017-0013873 (Credit Card)
  • 06/08/2017
  • Payment: Fee Preparing Copy of any Record(per page) - GC70627(a); Amount: $0.50 Receipt: IW-2017-0013873 (Credit Card)
  • 05/02/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/01/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 Not Held - Continued - Court Congestion to 07/19/2017
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --