HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 05:54:33

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/03/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Barbara A Foster against Gloria Alvarado in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX1736
  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Other Disposed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Ronald Frank
  • Courthouse

    Inglewood Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    Foster Barbara A.
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Alvarado Gloria Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
3/30/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
3/3/2017: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs
7/6/2017: Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
7/6/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 07/06/2017 and Judgment Debtor Sta...
7/6/2017: Minute Order of 07/06/2017 and Judgment Debtor Sta...
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 05/02/2017
5/2/2017: Minute Order of 05/02/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
7/6/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
5/2/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2017
  • Invoice: Sheriff?s Recovery Fee; Fee: $40.00; Balance: $40.00;
  • 07/19/2017
  • Payment: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Amount: $75.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0010295
  • 07/19/2017
  • Payment: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Amount: $75.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0015428 (Check)
  • 07/19/2017
  • Payment: Sheriff?s Recovery Fee; Amount: $40.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0015428 (Check)
  • 07/06/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 07/06/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 07/06/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk
  • 07/06/2017
  • Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs; Filed by: Clerk
  • 07/06/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 07/06/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/06/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 07/06/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 07/06/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Barbara A. Foster against Defendant Gloria Alvarado on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Barbara A. Foster on 03/03/2017 for the principal amount of $2,500.00 and costs of $115.00 for a total of $2,615.00.; Waived fees and costs in the amount of $115.00, including those incurred after judgment, must be paid directly to the court by Defendant Gloria Alvarado. A full or partial satisfaction of judgment will not be entered unless waived fees are paid per Government Code section 68637(b)(1). An Administrative fee of $25.00 must be assessed if the collection process is initiated to collect unpaid fees per Government Code section 68638.
  • 05/02/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/02/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 Not Held - Continued - Court Congestion to 07/06/2017
  • 05/02/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/06/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8
  • 05/02/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 05/02/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 05/02/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 03/30/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Barbara A. Foster (Plaintiff); As to: Gloria Alvarado (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 03/28/2017
  • 03/03/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Barbara A. Foster (Plaintiff); As to: Gloria Alvarado (Defendant)
  • 03/03/2017
  • Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Barbara A. Foster (Plaintiff)
  • 03/03/2017
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Barbara A. Foster (Plaintiff)
  • 03/03/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0010295 (Waived Court); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/03/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Ronald Frank at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --