HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 05:54:24

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/03/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Justin L Beltz against Wendy Woldt in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX1732
  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Other Disposed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    William Mctaggart
  • Courthouse

    Inglewood Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    Beltz Justin L.
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Woldt Wendy Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Unknown
8/9/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
4/13/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/3/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
7/11/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 07/11/2017 and Judgment Debtor Sta...
7/11/2017: Minute Order of 07/11/2017 and Judgment Debtor St...
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 05/01/2017
5/1/2017: Minute Order of 05/01/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
5/1/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
7/11/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2017
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 08/23/2017 ; Status Date changed from 07/11/2017 to 08/23/2017 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied
  • 08/09/2017
  • Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: Justin L. Beltz (Plaintiff); As to: Wendy Woldt (Defendant); Type: Full Satisfaction
  • 07/11/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 07/11/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 07/11/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk
  • 07/11/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 07/11/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/11/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 07/11/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 07/11/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Justin L. Beltz against Defendant Wendy Woldt on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Justin L. Beltz on 03/03/2017 for the principal amount of $400.00 and costs of $30.00 for a total of $430.00.
  • 05/02/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/01/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 Not Held - Continued - Court Congestion to 07/11/2017
  • 05/02/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/11/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8
  • 05/01/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 05/01/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 05/01/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 04/13/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Justin L. Beltz (Plaintiff); As to: Wendy Woldt (Defendant); Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 03/24/2017
  • 03/03/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Justin L. Beltz (Plaintiff); As to: Wendy Woldt (Defendant)
  • 03/03/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims <= $1,500: Filing for $1,500 or less- CCP 116.230(b)(1); Fee: $30.00; Payment: 30.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0010284 (Check); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/03/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. William McTaggart at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8
  • 03/03/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/01/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --