HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/02/2017 16:00:47

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/02/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by David Michael Angeloff against Expedia Inc A Corporation in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX1729
  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2017
  • Case Status

    Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    William Mctaggart
  • Courthouse

    Inglewood Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Defendant

    Expedia Inc. A Corporation Dba Travelocity.Com Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Dynamic International Airways Llc Dba Dynamic Airways Dba Dynamic Airways Llc Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Angeloff Eva Karol
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Angeloff David Michael
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Minute Order of 07/10/2017 and Judgment Debtor Sta...
7/10/2017: Minute Order of 07/10/2017 and Judgment Debtor St...
  Free
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
4/24/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
4/26/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/2/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
7/11/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Docu...
3/2/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Docu...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due
3/2/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 05/01/2017
5/1/2017: Minute Order of 05/01/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
7/10/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
5/1/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
5/1/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
7/10/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small...
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 07/10/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 07/10/2017
  • Updated -- Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims): Result: Result Date: 07/10/2017
  • 07/10/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 07/10/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk
  • 07/10/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/10/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 07/10/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 07/10/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Eva Karol Angeloff; Plaintiff David Michael Angeloff against Defendant Dynamic International Airways, LLC DBA Dynamic Airways, DBA Dynamic Airways, LLC on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by David Michael Angeloff, et al. on 03/02/2017 for the principal amount of $8,049.05 and costs of $275.00 for a total of $8,324.05.; Other: Judgment ordered against defendant: Dynamic International Airways, LLC only. The plaintiffs represent settlement arrangement entered into with defendant: Expedia, Inc.
  • 07/10/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party
  • 05/02/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/01/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 Not Held - Continued - Court Congestion to 07/10/2017
  • 05/01/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party
  • 05/01/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 05/01/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 05/01/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/01/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/10/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8
  • 04/26/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: David Michael Angeloff (Plaintiff); As to: Expedia, Inc., a corporation (Defendant); Service Cost: 80.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 04/06/2017
  • 04/24/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: David Michael Angeloff (Plaintiff); As to: Dynamic International Airways, LLC (Defendant); Service Cost: 120.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 04/11/2017
  • 03/03/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: 1170302E4781 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/03/2017
  • Invoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1170302E4781 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/03/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. William McTaggart at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8
  • 03/03/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/01/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8
  • 03/02/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: David Michael Angeloff (Plaintiff); Eva Karol Angeloff (Plaintiff); As to: Expedia, Inc., a corporation (Defendant); Dynamic International Airways, LLC (Defendant)
  • 03/02/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --