HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/20/2017 05:54:35

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/02/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Daniel B Gelfand against Joseph Digiulio Trustee Of The Wayne E Barlow Trust in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX1724
  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2017
  • Case Status

    Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    William Mctaggart
  • Courthouse

    Inglewood Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    Gelfand Daniel B.
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Joseph Digiulio Trustee Of The Wayne E. Barlow Trust Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Minute Order of 06/02/2017 and Judgment Debtor Sta...
6/2/2017: Minute Order of 06/02/2017 and Judgment Debtor Sta...
  Free
Download
[Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declarati...
6/27/2017: [Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declarat...
  Free
Download
Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaratio...
6/19/2017: Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declarati...
  Free
Download
(Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment)
8/11/2017: (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment)
  Free
Download
Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacat...
8/11/2017: Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vaca...
  Free
Download
[Notice of Postponement]
4/5/2017: [Notice of Postponement]
  Fees Apply
Download
Unknown
10/19/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Unknown
11/3/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - PER REQ...
4/3/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - PER REQ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
6/2/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
6/2/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/03/2017 and Ju...
11/3/2017: Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/03/2017 and J...
  Fees Apply
Download
More Documents Available

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 11/03/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/03/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk
  • 11/03/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk
  • 11/03/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/03/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 1 updated: Result Date to 11/03/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 11/03/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Daniel B. Gelfand on 03/02/2017 as follows: Defendant Joseph Digiulio, Trustee of the Wayne E. Barlow Trust does not owe the plaintiff Daniel B. Gelfand any money on plaintiff's claim.
  • 10/19/2017
  • Notice of Case Relocation Rescheduling; Filed by: Clerk
  • 10/19/2017
  • On the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/03/2017 at 01:30 PM in at Department 8 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court to 11/03/2017 01:30 PM at 11/03/2017 1:30 PM Non-Jury Trial in Department 1
  • 08/11/2017
  • Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment)
  • 08/11/2017
  • Updated -- Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims): Result: Vacated; Result Date: 08/11/2017
  • 08/11/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment) of 08/11/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 08/11/2017
  • Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment scheduled for 08/11/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 08/11/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 08/11/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/03/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8
  • 08/11/2017
  • Updated -- On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Daniel B. Gelfand on 03/02/2017, judgment entered on 06/02/2017 is vacated
  • 08/11/2017
  • On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Daniel B. Gelfand on 03/02/2017, judgment entered on 06/02/2017 as to Joseph Digiulio, Trustee of the Wayne E. Barlow Trust is vacated
  • 06/27/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims Motion to Vacate - CCP 116.745; Fee: $20.00; Payment: 20.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0014562 (Check); Balance: $0.00;
  • 06/27/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration]; Issued by: Clerk
  • 06/19/2017
  • Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration; Filed by: Joseph Digiulio, Trustee of the Wayne E. Barlow Trust (Defendant)
  • 06/19/2017
  • Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment scheduled for 08/11/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8
  • 06/02/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 06/02/2017
  • Updated -- Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) PER REQUEST OF DEFENDANT: Result: Result Date: 06/02/2017
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --