HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/18/2017 09:10:17

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/02/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Sophia Darby against National Store Inc in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX1723
  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Judgment Entered
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    William Mctaggart
  • Courthouse

    Inglewood Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Defendant

    Fallas Clothing Store Corporate Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Darby Sophia
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    National Store Inc. Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
5/2/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
5/17/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/16/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims...
  Fees Apply
Download
Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
3/2/2017: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
6/26/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 06/26/2017
6/26/2017: Minute Order of 06/26/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
6/26/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
6/26/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small...
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 06/26/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims): Result: Result Date: 06/26/2017
  • 06/26/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 06/26/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 06/26/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 06/26/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/26/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 06/26/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 06/26/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered on the Amended Plaintiff's Claim (1st) filed by Sophia Darby on 03/02/2017: Defendant National Store Inc. does not owe the plaintiff Sophia Darby any money on plaintiff's claim.
  • 06/26/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party
  • 05/17/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Sophia Darby (Plaintiff); As to: National Store Inc. (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: Yes; Service Date: 05/10/2017
  • 05/02/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/02/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court to 06/26/2017
  • 05/02/2017
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Sophia Darby (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: No
  • 05/02/2017
  • ** Case Name changed from SOPHIA DARBY vs FALLAS CLOTHING STORE CORPORATE to SOPHIA DARBY vs NATIONAL STORE INC.
  • 05/02/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/26/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8
  • 03/16/2017
  • Updated -- Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: Status Date changed from 03/02/2017 to 03/16/2017
  • 03/02/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Sophia Darby (Plaintiff); As to: Fallas Clothing Store Corporate (Defendant)
  • 03/02/2017
  • Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Sophia Darby (Plaintiff)
  • 03/02/2017
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Sophia Darby (Plaintiff)
  • 03/02/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0010268 (Waived Court); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/02/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. William McTaggart at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8
  • 03/02/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/02/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8
  • 03/02/2017
  • Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Sophia Darby (Plaintiff); As to: National Store Inc. (Defendant)
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --